Gonzalez v. Mission Senior Living, LLC
Plaintiff: Jodi Gonzalez
Defendant: Mission Senior Living, LLC and Mission Senior Living, LLC doing business as Fernley Estates Assisted Living and Memory Care
Case Number: 3:2021cv00372
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 12 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Mission Senior Living, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2021. (Molleck, Luke) Modified on 10/8/2021 add partial (WJ).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Stipulation. Mission Senior Living, LLC answer to ECF No. #1 Complaint due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Mission Senior Living, LLC. (Guinn, Steven)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00372-MMD-WGC. (no image attached) (LE)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jodi Gonzalez re #1 Complaint,. Mission Senior Living, LLC served on 9/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Doyle, Kerry)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on September 13, 2021. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
September 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #4 Notice of Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge and Consent Form. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (SMR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 9/9/2021. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (SMR)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 DISREGARD ENTRY. ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) Modified on 8/19/2021 to note entered in error (SMR).
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mission Senior Living, LLC. (SMR)
August 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mission Senior Living, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6601412) by Jodi Gonzalez. Proof of service due by 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Doyle, Kerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Mission Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Gonzalez
Represented By: Kerry S. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Senior Living, LLC doing business as Fernley Estates Assisted Living and Memory Care
Represented By: Luke W Molleck
Represented By: Steven E. Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?