In Re DeAndre Hawkins
In Re: DeAndre Hawkins
Case Number: 3:2021cv00383
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will SEND to Hawkins the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint and instructions for the same (Mailed to Plaintiff on 9/27/2021). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hawkins will have until October 27, 2021, to submit a complaint to this Court. If Hawkins does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
August 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SC)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by In Re Deandre Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (SC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re DeAndre Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: DeAndre Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?