Douglas v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: Delbert Douglas
Respondent: William Gittere and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2021cv00431
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan M Kirshbaum on behalf of Petitioner Delbert Douglas. (Kirshbaum, Jonathan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Martin H Novillo on behalf of Petitioner Delbert Douglas. (Novillo, Martin)
November 24, 2021 Attorney update in case: Attorney ESP Law Library and Rene Valladares withdrawn from the case. (Kirshbaum, Jonathan)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents William Gittere, Nevada Attorney General. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Perlick, Jessica)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Investigator, by Petitioner Delbert Douglas. Filed and Denied as per ECF No. #6 Order. Responses due by 11/11/2021. (SMR)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Delbert Douglas. Filed Pursuant ECF No. #6 Order, Granted as per ECF No. #6 (SMR)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Delbert Douglas. Filed pursuant to ECF No. #6 Order. (SMR)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Clerk of Court is directed to file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus, the motion for appointment of counsel, and the motion for investigator, currently on the docket at ECF No. #1 -1, #1 -2, and #1 -3. Petitioner Delbert Douglas' motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #1 -2 ) is granted. The Federal Public Defender (FPD) is provisionally appointed as counsel and will have 30 days (11/27/2021) to undertake direct representation of Petitioner or to indicate the FPD's inability to represent Petitioner in these proceedings. The Clerk of Court is further directed to add Nevada Attorney General Aaron D. Ford as counsel for Respondents. Respondents' counsel must enter a notice of appearance within 21 days of entry of this order, but no further response will be required from Respondents until further order of the Court. The Clerk is further directed to send a copy of this order and all prior filings to both the Nevada Attorney General and the Federal Public Defender. (Electronic service on 10/28/2021; ECF Nos. #1 - #4 via NEF Regeneration). The motion for investigator is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00; FILING FEE PAID; receipt number NVRNO5382 (no image attached) (SMR)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $5.00, receipt number NVLAS077982. Filing fee PAID. (SC)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying ECF No. #1 IFP Application. Payment of $5.00 filing fee due by 11/15/2021. Clerk shall send Petitioner two copies of this order. (Two copies attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) Petitioner must make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 2nd Copy of Order for Petitioner)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Gittere, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:21-cv-00431. (DRM)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Delbert Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Counsel, #3 Motion for Investigator) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delbert Douglas
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Represented By: Martin H Novillo
Represented By: Jonathan M Kirshbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Gittere
Represented By: Jessica Perlick
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Jessica Perlick
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?