Ulloa v. Nevada Gold Mines LLC
Plaintiff: Juan Ulloa
Defendant: Nevada Gold Mines LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00495
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Craig S Denney
2 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE due to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00495-RCJ-CSD. (no image attached) (LG)
December 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nevada Gold Mines LLC re ECF No. #1 -2. (HKL)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Juan Ulloa. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nevada Gold Mines LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6717965) by Juan Ulloa. Proof of service due by 3/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Nevada Gold Mines LLC) (Kemp, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (LE)
December 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulloa v. Nevada Gold Mines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ulloa
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Gold Mines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?