Moraga v. Russell et al
Petitioner: Roy Daniels Moraga
Respondent: Perry Russell and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2022cv00013
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re ECF Nos. #4 Order, #6 Judgment, by Petitioner Roy Daniels Moraga. Responses due by 3/21/2022. (DRM)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 JUDGMENT re: ECF No. #4 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Roy Daniels Moraga. (Filed and dismissed pursuant to ECF No. #4 .) (HKL)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Petitioner's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is denied as moot. This action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability, as jurists of reason would not find the dismissal of the petition on jurisdictional grounds to be debatable or wrong. The Clerk of Court is instructed to add Nevada Attorney General Aaron D. Ford as counsel for Respondents. No response is required from Respondents other than to respond to any orders of a reviewing court. Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, the Clerk of Court will file on the docket and serve the Petition (ECF No. #1 -1) on the Nevada Attorney General and this order by sending a notice of electronic filing to the Nevada Attorney General's office (e-service 3/2/2022; petition by subsequent filing). The Clerk of Court is further directed to enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice, and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/2/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE due to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00013-RCJ-CSD. (no image attached) (LG)
January 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (Recall). (WJ)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Russell, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:22-cv-00013. (DRM)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Roy Daniels Moraga. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC 2254) (DRM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/10/2022) (DRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moraga v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy Daniels Moraga
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Perry Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?