Keck v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: William Keck
Respondent: Warden William Gittere and Aaron D. Ford
Case Number: 3:2022cv00031
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number NVLAS079617. (HKL)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Petitioner will have 90 days from the date of this order to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (due by 5/2/2022). Respondents will have 90 days from the filing of an amended petition to file an answer or other response to the amended petition. Petitioner will have 60 days following the filing of an answer to file a reply. Respondents will thereafter have 30 days following the filing of a reply to file a response to the reply. (See PDF Order for additional contingent deadlines and specifics). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acceptance of Appointment and Notice of Appearance by William Keck. (Fiedler, Randolph)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Jessica Perlick on behalf of Respondents Aaron D. Ford, William Gittere. Notice of Association of Counsel for Respondents (Perlick, Jessica)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Charles Lawrence Finlayson on behalf of Respondents Aaron D. Ford, William Gittere. Notice of Appearance for Respondents (Finlayson, Charles)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that Keck's IFP application [ECF No. #1 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. $5.00 filing fee due by February 25, 2022. Keck's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. #2 ] is GRANTED. FPD is appointed to represent Keck. FPD will have until February 25, 2022, to either (1) file a notice of appearance as counsel or (2) file a notice indicating its inability to represent Keck in these proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically SERVE a copy of this order on the FPD. The Clerk of Court is also directed to ADD AG, as counsel for respondents and to provide respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the AG only. (NEFs # 1-3 regenerated to AG on 1/26/2022.) Finally, the Clerk of Court is directed to electronically SERVE upon respondents a copy of Keck's petition (ECF No. #1 -1) and a copy of this order. (E-service 1/26/2022; Petition attached hereto to perfect service.) Respondents have until February 25, 2022, to enter a notice of appearance, but no further action in this case is required unless the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Petition ECF No. 1-1)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE due to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:22-cv-00031-JAD-CSD. (no image attached) (LG)
January 20, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (Recall). (WJ)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner William Keck. (Fiedler, Randolph)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Keck. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2254 By a Person in State Custody Sentenced to Death, #2 Index Exhibits in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2254 By a Person in State Custody Sentenced to Death, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18) (Fiedler, Randolph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keck v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Keck
Represented By: Randolph Fiedler
Represented By: Jocelyn Murphy
Represented By: Katie Chadliev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden William Gittere
Represented By: Charles Lawrence Finlayson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Jessica Perlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aaron D. Ford
Represented By: Charles Lawrence Finlayson
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Jessica Perlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?