Cota v. Director of Nursing - ESP et al
Plaintiff: Michael Cota
Defendant: Director of Nursing - ESP, Dr. Hanf and David Drummond
Case Number: 3:2022cv00039
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 USCA Docketing Letter re petition for writ of mandamus received. USCA Case No. 22-70040. (HKL)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 Submission of PROPOSED Subpoena, by Plaintiff Michael Cota. (DRM)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 USCA Docketing Letter re petition for writ of mandamus received. USCA Case No. 22-70040 assigned. (HKL)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for ruling on preliminary injunction (ECF No. #3 ) by Plaintiff Michael Cota. Responses due by 2/28/2022. (HKL)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, by Michael Cota. No changes to parties. (DRM)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Michael Cota. Responses due by 2/9/2022. (HKL)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HKL)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Cota. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (HKL)
January 24, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cota v. Director of Nursing - ESP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cota
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Nursing - ESP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hanf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?