Chambers v. State of Nevada et al
Petitioner: Gary Chambers
Respondent: State of Nevada and Attorney General State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2022cv00097
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents Attorney General State of Nevada, State of Nevada. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Serreze, Sheryl)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVLAS-080415. (DRM)
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Gary Chambers. (Filed and granted pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order.) (DRM)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Gary Chambers. (Filed pursuant to ECF No. #3 Order; E-service to FPD; AG 3/25/2022.) (DRM)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Clerk is directed to separately file the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. #1 -1) and the Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -2). Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -2) is granted. The FPD is appointed to represent the petitioner. Clerk is directed to e-serve upon the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. #1 -1). (E-service 3/25/2022; Petition upon subsequent filing.) FPD will have 30 days from the date of this order (4/24/2022) to file a notice of appearance, or to indicate to the Court its inability to represent the petitioner in this case. The requirement that Petitioner pay the filing fee for this action or file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis is suspended. Clerk of the Court is directed to add AG as counsel for Respondents and to provide Respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the Attorney General only. (E-service ECF Nos. #1 - #2 via NEF regeneration on 3/25/2022.) Respondents will have 30 days from the date of this order (4/24/2022) to appear in this action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:22-cv-00097. (HKL)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Gary Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel) (HKL)
February 18, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Chambers
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Nevada
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Sheryl Serreze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?