Sanchez v. Reubart
Plaintiff: Jasmine Paul Sanchez
Defendant: William Reubart
Case Number: 3:2022cv00133
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE/Demand for return of documents by Jasmine Paul Sanchez. (HKL)
May 6, 2022 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - This action is dismissed without prejudice based on Sanchez's failure to pay the full filing fee in compliance with the Court's March 22, 2022, order (ECF No. #3 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. If Sanchez wishes to pursue his claims, he must file a complaint in a new case and pay the full $402 filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Mail (e-filing) Returned as REFUSED ("I/M refused to give signed papers showing he received his documents, thus refusing delivery") re ECF No. #6 Order on Motion, addressed to Jasmine Sanchez. (HKL)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Sanchez's motion for an exemption from General Order 2012-01's electronic filling and service provisions (ECF No. #5 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for any and all legal documents to be sent through US postal service only by Plaintiff Jasmine Paul Sanchez. Responses due by 4/14/2022. (HKL)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 Mail (e-filing) REFUSED ("refused delivery of U.S. District Court e-file notice by not uncovering his window") re ECF No. #3 Order addressed to Jasmine Sanchez. (HKL)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Sanchez's IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) is denied. Full $402 filing fee due within 30 days of entry of this order (4/21/2022). Clerk is directed to send Sanchez two copies of this order. (Two copies attached hereto for distribution via ESP law library) Sanchez must make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fee. Clerk is directed to retain the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1), but not file it at this time. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 2nd Copy of Order for Plaintiff)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jasmine Paul Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (HKL)
March 18, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Reubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Paul Sanchez
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Reubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?