Bonilla v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Yolanda Bonilla
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00251
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 754 Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC added.. (Dick, Anthony)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/29/2022.(Dick, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Anthony D. Dick and approving Designation of Local Counsel Scott M. Mahoney. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 7/15/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
July 14, 2022 Filing 11 EXHIBIT Certificate of Good Standing to #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.. (Mahoney, Scott)
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. Attorney Scott Mahoney advised to review and comply with LR IA 11-2(b)(3) and file your certificate of good standing. File the document as a separate entry and link that document to Motion #9 . (no image attached) (WJ)
July 12, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony D Dick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott M Mahoney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6971083) by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have to and including July 15, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 23, 2022 Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 23, 2022 Filing 6 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Mahoney, Scott)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda Bonilla re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC served on 6/3/2022. (Kemp, James)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC re ECF No. #3 Notice of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (CJD)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Yolanda Bonilla. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Appeals Officer Decision and Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC) (Kemp, James)
June 2, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (WJ)
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Yolanda Bonilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6924608) by Yolanda Bonilla. Proof of service due by 8/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC) (Kemp, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla v. O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Bonilla
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Represented By: Anthony D. Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?