Durand v. Maritza
Plaintiff: Roberto Durand
Defendant: Maritza
Case Number: 3:2022cv00371
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Roberto Durand. (DRM)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents. Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application (attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by ESP law library). On or before November 15, 2022, Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 or file with the Court: 1) a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis for inmate; 2) a financial certificate; and 3) a copy of the inmate's prison or jail trust fund account statement for the precious six-month period. Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
August 18, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HKL)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roberto Durand. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons) (HKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durand v. Maritza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Durand
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?