Garza v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Brandon L. Garza
Defendant: State of Nevada and William Williams
Case Number: 3:2023cv00041
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon L. Garza. (CJS)
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon L. Garza. (CJS)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER -The IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has until April 3, 2023, to either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a new fully complete IFP application as detailed herein. Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the approved form IFP application for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but not file it at this time. (Form and instr attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #4 Letter addressed to Oscar Hanes. (This document was filed in error in this case, so this return is not for the Plaintiff.) (CJS)
January 30, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Electronic filing of prisoner filings in civil rights cases at Ely State Prison is now mandatory under General Order 2012-01 (DRM)
January 30, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
January 30, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 LETTER from Oscar Hanes. Forms mailed to Mr. Hanes on 1/30/2023. (DRM)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon L. Garza. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Counsel)(DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garza v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon L. Garza
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?