Ruiz v. Dokiwari
Plaintiff: Carlos Ruiz
Defendant: D. Dokiwari and Nevada Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2023cv00187
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Action, by Plaintiff Carlos Ruiz. (DRM)
June 13, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. Pursuant to #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (DRM) Modified on 6/14/2023 - Re-NEF (CJS).
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - $402 filing fee, or fully complete IFP application, due by 7/14/2023. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply with this order this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice. Clerk is directed to send P approved IFP application form w instructions (IFP form and instr attached hereto for distribution to P via NNCC law library) and retain the complaint (ECF No. 1-1) but not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (CJS)
May 4, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (CJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Dokiwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Ruiz
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Dokiwari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?