Jackson v. Stolk et al
Plaintiff: Tarontae D. Jackson
Defendant: Stolk and Brown
Case Number: 3:2023cv00247
Filed: June 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Tarontae D. Jackson. (DLS)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - ECF No. #1 IFP application is denied without prejudice. $402 filing fee, or fully complete IFP application due by 9/11/2023. Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the approved IFP application form for an inmate, and instructions, and to retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but not file it at this time. (IFP form and instr attached hereto for distribution to P via ESP law library.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 7/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 7, 2023 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
June 7, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
June 6, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tarontae D. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Stolk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarontae D. Jackson
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?