Volpicelli v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Ferrill J. Volpicelli
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Don Kravos, Nevada Department of Corrections and James Dzurenda
Case Number: 3:2023cv00369
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2023 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion, by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. (Merrill, Janet)
August 31, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to ECF No. #7 Motion for Screening of Complaint, by Plaintiff Ferrill J. Volpicelli. Replies due by 9/7/2023. (DRM)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Plaintiff Ferrill J. Volpicelli. (DRM)
August 30, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION/Request for US Marshal to serve defendants, by Plaintiff Ferrill J. Volpicelli. Responses due by 9/13/2023. (GA) (misc) (nondispositive)
August 22, 2023 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT State Defendants' Supplement to the Joint Status Report by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections.. (Merrill, Janet)
August 22, 2023 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Don Kravos, United States Postal Service.. (Rose, Patrick)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time to file Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ref. ECF No. #7 Motion) by Plaintiff Ferrill J. Volpicelli. Responses due by 8/31/2023. (DRM) (dispositive)
August 10, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Screening of the Complaint by Defendant State of Nevada and Defendant James Dzurenda by Defendants James Dzurenda, Nevada Department of Corrections. Responses due by 8/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B)(Merrill, Janet) (misc) (presiding)
August 9, 2023 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ferrill J. Volpicelli. (GA)
August 9, 2023 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Don Kravos, United States Postal Service.. (Rose, Patrick)
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Don Kravos, United States Postal Service.. (Rose, Patrick)
July 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Federal Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Don Kravos, United States Postal Service. Responses due by 8/11/2023. (Rose, Patrick) (answer)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/25/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/9/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 25, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District of the State of Nevada, County of Pershing, Case Number 27CV-OTH-2023-0166, by Don Kravos, USPS. Proof of service due by 9/12/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS_044, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A_Summons and Complaint) (Rose, Patrick) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volpicelli v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrill J. Volpicelli
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Represented By: Law Library - Lovelock CC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Kravos
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Janet L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Represented By: Janet L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?