Cabalan v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cabalan
Defendant: State of Nevada, James Dzurenda, Charles Daniels, William Gittere, William Reubart, David Drummond, Tasheena Cooke, Hernandez, S. Chilson, Stephen Mollet, T. Baltierra, D. Tristan and T. Smith
Interested Party: Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2024cv00137
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against T. Baltierra, S. Chilson, Tasheena Cooke, Charles Daniels, David Drummond, James Dzurenda, William Gittere, Hernandez, Stephen Mollet, William Reubart, T. Smith, D. Tristan (Filing fee $405 NOT paid) by Jeffrey Cabalan. Complaint filed per ECF No. #4 Order. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/25/2024. Proof of service due by 8/13/2024. (GA)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER - A decision on the IFP application ECF No. #3 is deferred. The Clerk of Court will file the Complaint ECF No. #1 -1 and send Plaintiff a courtesy copy. (Copy of complaint attached hereto for distribution to P via Ely State Prison law library.) It is further ordered that Defendant the State of Nevada ex rel. NDOC is dismissed from the Complaint with prejudice, as amendment would be futile. Claims will proceed or are dismissed as detailed herein. This action is stayed 90 days to allow parties to settle. 90-day report due by 8/13/2024. If case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee. Clerk is directed to add the Nevada Department of Corrections to the docket as an Interested Party and e-serve a copy of this order, and copy of Plaintiff's FAC on the AG by adding to the docket. (E-service of order & Complaint 5/16/2024). AG shall advise within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order (6/5/2024) re acceptance of service for the purpose of participation in the Early Mediation Program. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/15/2024. (copy of complaint sent to P) (For Distribution by law library.) (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint ECF 1-1)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Jeffrey Cabalan. (DLS)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (GA)
March 22, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (GA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabalan v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cabalan
Represented By: Law Library - Ely State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Reubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasheena Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Chilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Baltierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tristan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?