Republican National Committee et al v. Burgess et al
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party, Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc. and Donald Szymanski
Defendant: Cari-Ann Burgess, Jan Galassini, Lorena Portillo, Lynn Marie Goya, Francisco Aguilar and American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada
Intervenor: Vet Voice Foundation, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans and Democratic National Committee
Case Number: 3:2024cv00198
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to #71 Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendants Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. (Bravo, Daniel)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER approving #85 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hayden Johnson for American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada and approving Designation of Local Counsel Sadmira Ramic. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/27/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 26, 2024 Filing 85 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Hayden Johnson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sadmira Ramic (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7729681) by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada. (Ramic, Sadmira)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER APPROVING #83 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aseem Mulji for American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada and approving Designation of Local Counsel Sadmira Ramic. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/26/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 25, 2024 Filing 83 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aseem Mulji and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sadmira Ramic (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7728305) by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada. (Ramic, Sadmira)
June 24, 2024 Filing 82 JOINDER to #78 Reply by Defendants Lynn Marie Goya, Lorena Portillo. (Logsdon, Lisa) Modified on 6/24/2024 #60 (WJ).
June 21, 2024 Filing 81 RESPONSE to #71 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. Replies due by 6/28/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2024 Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/21/2024. The Court denies Alliance's proposed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #69 ) because it was filed before the Court granted Alliance's motion to intervene. The Court notes that Alliance has filed a Motion to Dismiss after the Court granted it leave to intervene (ECF No. #71 ). That motion remains pending.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 20, 2024 Filing 79 JOINDER to #78 Reply by Defendants Cari-Ann Burgess, Jan Galassini. (Hickman, Elizabeth)
June 20, 2024 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to #60 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Francisco Aguilar. (St-Jules, Laena)
June 20, 2024 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to #59 Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Ring, Nathan)
June 18, 2024 Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Document by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada. Responses due by 7/2/2024. (Ramic, Sadmira) (dispositive)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #48 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gary Lawkowski for Donald J. Trump for President 2023, Inc.,and approving Designation of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/14/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 13, 2024 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #60 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. Replies due by 6/20/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2024 Filing 73 RESPONSE to #59 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. Replies due by 6/20/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2024 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Democratic National Committee. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Velto, Alex)
June 7, 2024 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendants Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. Responses due by 6/21/2024. (Bravo, Daniel)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Vet Voice and NARA's motion to intervene (ECF No. #15 ) is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/6/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 5, 2024 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss by Intervenor Defendants Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. Responses due by 6/19/2024. (Bravo, Daniel)
June 5, 2024 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bravo, Daniel)
June 4, 2024 Filing 67 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Friday, July 19, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
June 4, 2024 Filing 65 CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
May 31, 2024 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Intervene, by Intervenor Defendants Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. (Schrager, Bradley)
May 31, 2024 Filing 63 JOINDER to #60 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Cari-Ann Burgess, Jan Galassini. (Hickman, Elizabeth)
May 30, 2024 Filing 61 JOINDER to #60 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Lynn Marie Goya, Lorena Portillo. (Logsdon, Lisa)
May 30, 2024 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Francisco Aguilar. Responses due by 6/13/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/9/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/14/2024. (St-Jules, Laena) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 30, 2024 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,,, by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. Responses due by 6/13/2024. (Velto, Alex)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #57 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List : Daniel H. Stewart, Esq., of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP, removed on behalf of Intervenor-Defendant, Democratic National Committee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/29/2024.; (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 29, 2024 Filing 57 MOTION to remove attorney Daniel H. Stewart from the Electronic Service List in this case by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Stewart, Daniel)
May 28, 2024 Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/28/2024. The Democratic National Committee ("DNC") filed a motion to intervene as a defendant (ECF No. #20 ("Motion")), to which Plaintiffs submitted a notice of non-opposition (ECF No. #54 ) and Defendants did not respond. The Motion alleges that, if Plaintiffs receive their requested relief, the DNC will need to expend additional resources to educate Nevadan voters, some Democratic Nevadan voters' ballots will not be counted, and electing Democratic candidates to public office will become more difficult. (ECF No. #20 .) The Court finds that the DNC may intervene as of right, as their Motion was timely, they have claimed significantly protectable interests in Nevada's mail ballot receipt deadline, those interests would be practically impaired if Plaintiffs prevail, and their interests are not adequately protected by the existing parties to this action. See Wilderness Soc. v. U.S. Forest Serv., 630 F.3d 1173, 1177 (9th Cir. 2011) (en banc). Even if intervention as of right were not warranted, the DNC has demonstrated that they meet the requirements of permissive intervention. The Motion was timely, the DNC does not raise new claims, and the DNC's arguments will share a common question of law or fact with the main action. See Donnelly v. Glickman, 159 F.3d 405, 412 (9th Cir. 1998); Freedom From Religion Found., Inc. v. Geithner, 644 F.3d 836, 844 (9th Cir. 2011) (holding that the Court does not need an independent basis for jurisdiction where, as here, a proposed intervenor raises no new claims). Moreover, Plaintiffs do not oppose the Motion, and Defendants are deemed to have consented by failing to file a response to the Motion. See LR 7-2(d). The Motion is therefore granted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GIVM)
May 24, 2024 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Intervene, by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. Replies due by 5/31/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2024 Filing 54 NON-OPPOSITION to #20 Motion to Intervene by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the withdrawal of Daniel H. Stewart and Brownstein Hyatt Farber & Schreck as attorney of record for the Democratic National Committee in the above- entitled action is ACCEPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Democratic National Committee will be represented in this matter by Nathan R. Ring, Alex Velto, and Devon Reese of Reese Ring Velto, PLLC and they are Designated the Resident Nevada Counsel for the Democratic National Committee. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER approving ECF No. #42 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Christopher D. Dodge for Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley S. Schrager. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 23, 2024 Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2024. By Deputy Clerk: Karen Walker.The Court has reviewed the Motion/Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary Lawkowski (ECF No. #48 ). Mr. Lawkowski is directed to file, under seal, the complaint filed with the State Bar of Arizona and an explanation as to how the matter was resolved.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER approving ECF No. #43 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Columbo for Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) (Main Document 50 replaced on 5/23/2024) (KW).
May 23, 2024 Filing 49 WITHDRAWAL of #44 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2024 Filing 48 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary Lawkowski and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7695399) by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 47 STIPULATION by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Ring, Nathan) (other) (attorney)
May 22, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE of Withdrawal of ECF 41 by Democratic National Committee re #41 Stipulation. (Ring, Nathan)
May 22, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #41 Stipulation. Attorney Nathan Ring advised to review document #41 . Document appears to have been filed in the wrong case. Please properly file your document in the correct case 2:24-cv-0518-CDS-MDC and file a notice of withdrawal of said document in this case. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 22, 2024 Filing 44 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David A. Warrington and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7694458) by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 43 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Columbo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7694447) by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2024 Filing 42 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher D. Dodge and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S. Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7694250) by Intervenor Defendants Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. (Schrager, Bradley)
May 21, 2024 Filing 41 STIPULATION Substituting Designated Resident Nevada Counsel for Amicus by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Ring, Nathan) (other) (attorney)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER approving ECF No. #28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Warrington for Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting ECF No. #34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request). Mr. Gary Lawkowski is hereby ORDERED to file a Verified Petition and Designation ofLocal Counsel and for the court's electronic filing system at PACER by May 24, 2024. Mr. Michael Columbo is hereby ORDERED to file a Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel and for the court's electronic filing system at PACER by May 24, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving ECF No. #27 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas S. Vaseliou for Republican National Committee, et al and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER approving ECF No. #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Conor D. Woodfin for Republican National Committee, et al and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jeffrey F. Barr. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER approving ECF No. #25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gilbert C. Dickey for Republican National Committee, etc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jeffrey F. Barr. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER approving ECF No. #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas R. McCarthy for Republican National Committee, et al and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jeffrey F. Barr. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 17, 2024 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re 7 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,, 8 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,, by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey) (presiding)
May 17, 2024 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski, Nevada Republican Party re #1 Complaint,,,. Lorena Portillo served on 5/9/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski, Nevada Republican Party re #1 Complaint,,,. Lynn Marie Goya served on 5/9/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski, Nevada Republican Party re #1 Complaint,,,. Jan Galassini served on 5/15/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski, Nevada Republican Party re #1 Complaint,,,. Cari-Ann Burgess served on 5/15/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski, Nevada Republican Party re #1 Complaint,,,. Francisco Aguilar served on 5/15/2024. (Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David A Warrington and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alicia R Ashcraft (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7689998) by Plaintiff Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/21/2024 (WJ).
May 17, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas S. Vaseliou and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7689994) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Conor D. Woodfin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7689984) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert C. Dickey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeffrey F Barr (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7689977) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. McCarthy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alicia R. Ashcraft (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7689959) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barr, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving ECF No. #19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heath Hyatt for Democratic National Committee and approving Designation of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER approving ECF No. #18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Margo S. Jasukaitis for Democratic National Committee and approving Designation of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER approving ECF No. #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton for Democratic National Committee and approving Designation of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 13, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. Responses due by 5/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stewart, Daniel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Heath Hyatt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7683399) by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Stewart, Daniel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Margo S. Jasukaitis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7683393) by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Stewart, Daniel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Hamilton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel H. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7683363) by Intervenor Defendant Democratic National Committee. (Stewart, Daniel)
May 13, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE Notice Filed Pursuant to Local Rule IA 11-1(b)(2) by Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans, Vet Voice Foundation. (Schrager, Bradley)
May 10, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene Motion to Intervene as Defendants by Intervenor Defendants Vet Voice Foundation, Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans. Responses due by 5/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Schrager, Bradley)
May 9, 2024 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:24-cv-0198-MMD-CLB. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 9, 2024 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 5/9/2024. With good cause appearing, the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DWU)
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Document re #9 Summons Issued as to Cari-Ann Burgess Registrar of Voters for Washoe County (Service of corrected image is attached; Main Document at #9 replaced.) (DLS)
May 6, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:24-cv-0198-ART-CLB. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 6, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/6/2024. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KJM)
May 6, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Glassini, #2 Portillo, #3 Goya, #4 Aguilar) (DRM) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/7/2024) (DLS).
May 6, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DRM)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael A. Columbo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/17/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 3, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary M. Lawkowski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/17/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David A. Warrington to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/17/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thomas S. Vaseliou to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/17/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Conor D. Woodfin to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/17/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Thomas R. McCarthy to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER #www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/17/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ashcraft, Alicia)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7673557) by Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Republican National Committee, Donald Szymanski, Nevada Republican Party. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/13/2024. Proof of service due by 8/1/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons (Burgess), #3 Summons Summons (Galassini), #4 Summons Summons (Portillo), #5 Summons Summons (Goya), #6 Summons Summons (Aguilar)) (Ashcraft, Alicia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republican National Committee et al v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Alicia R Ashcraft
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Conor Woodfin
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: David Warrington
Represented By: Gary Lawkowski
Represented By: Michael A. Columbo
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Republican Party
Represented By: Alicia R Ashcraft
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Conor Woodfin
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: David Warrington
Represented By: Gary Lawkowski
Represented By: Michael A. Columbo
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc.
Represented By: Alicia R Ashcraft
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Michael A. Columbo
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: Conor Woodfin
Represented By: David Warrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Szymanski
Represented By: Alicia R Ashcraft
Represented By: Conor D. Woodfin
Represented By: Jeffrey Frederick Barr
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Gilbert C. Dickey
Represented By: Thomas S. Vaseliou
Represented By: Conor Woodfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cari-Ann Burgess
Represented By: Elizabeth Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Galassini
Represented By: Elizabeth Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorena Portillo
Represented By: Lisa Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Marie Goya
Represented By: Lisa Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Aguilar
Represented By: Laena St-Jules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Civil Liberties Union Of Nevada
Represented By: Hayden Johnson
Represented By: Sadmira Ramic
Represented By: Aseem Mulji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Vet Voice Foundation
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Christopher D. Dodge
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: David Robert Fox
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Heath Hyatt
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Margo S. Jasukaitis
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Daniel Henry Stewart
Represented By: Alex R. Velto
Represented By: Devon T. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?