Blue Water Petroleum Corp. v. Atakam Group Inc. et al
Defendant: Andrei Osichnuk and Alexander Dekhtyar
Counter Claimant: Andrew Osichnuk and Atakam Group Inc.
Counter Defendant: Blue Water Petroleum Corp., Nevada Agency and Transfer Company and Vladimir Ivanov
Case Number: 3:2024cv00203
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Cristina D Silva
3 Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 27 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2024 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Crtrm Administrator: Karen Walker; Pla Counsel: Frank Gilmore; Def Counsel: Alexander Calaway and Christian McKinnon; Court Reporter: Kathy French; Recording start and end times: 1:17 p.m. - 3:04 p.m.; Courtroom: 5. The Court addresses the parties regarding the purpose of today's hearing. Mr. Gilmore and Mr. Calaway present arguments. The Court issues oral ruling. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 12) is denied.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 28, 2024 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Osichnuk, Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar re #22 Summons Issued. Nevada Agency and Transfer Company served on 6/21/2024. (Calaway, Alexander)
June 28, 2024 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFFS STATUS REPORT REGARDING INFORMAL NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION [ECF 12] by Plaintiff Blue Water Petroleum Corp.. (Gilmore, Frank)
June 28, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Defendant's Response and Objection to Plaintiff's Informal Request to Withdraw Their Motion and Vacate Hearing by Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk re #12 Motion for TRO, 23 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion,. (Calaway, Alexander)
June 20, 2024 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/20/2024. By Deputy Clerk: Karen Walker.A hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #12 ) is set for July 1, 2024, at 1:00 P.M. in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 17, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vladimir Ivanov, Nevada Agency and Transfer Company re ECF Nos. #16 , #17 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Nevada Agency and Transfer Company) (DRM)
June 12, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #12 Motion for TRO by Defendants Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. Replies due by 6/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Calaway, Alexander)
June 6, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. (McKinnon, Christian)
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING VIDEO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - A video case management conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing Technology will be held on TUESDAY, JULY 16, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. The parties are directed to contact the Courtroom Administrator, Ashlyn Bye, at Ashlyn_Bye@nvd.uscourts.gov, by THURSDAY, JULY 11, 2024, to provide the e-mail address of all counsel who will be attending the hearing. The Zoom invite to the scheduled hearing will be sent via e-mail at least one (1) day prior to the hearing to the participants e-mail provided to the Court. In advance of the mandatory case management conference, the parties shall file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than TUESDAY, JULY 9, 2024. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report electronically on CM/ECF by 4:00 p.m. on TUESDAY, JULY 9, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
May 31, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/31/2024. Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (ECF No. #12 ). The normal briefing schedule will apply. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NYL)
May 31, 2024 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Vladimir Ivanov by Counter Claimants Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. (Calaway, Alexander)
May 31, 2024 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Nevada Agency and Transfer Company by Defendants Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. (Calaway, Alexander)
May 30, 2024 Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 30, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/9/2024., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/14/2024.), COUNTERCLAIM against Blue Water Petroleum Corp., Nevada Agency and Transfer Company, Vladimir Ivanov by Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk, Atakam Group Inc.. filed by Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk, Atakam Group Inc..(Calaway, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 30, 2024 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:24-cv-00203-MMD-CSD. (no image attached) (DRM)
May 29, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Blue Water Petroleum Corp.. Responses due by 6/12/2024. (Gilmore, Frank)
May 21, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Blue Water Petroleum Corp.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gilmore, Frank)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Time : Answer/response to complaint due by 5/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 5/20/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 20, 2024 Filing 9 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. (Calaway, Alexander) (extend) (answer)
May 15, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Calaway, Alexander)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Atakam Group Inc., Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Calaway, Alexander)
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 Petition for Removal. Attorney Alexander Calaway advised to review the petition along with his exhibits. Exhibit A claims to be the complaint from the 2d Judicial Court but appears to be a stipulation and order to continue hearing. Counsel is advised to correctly refile his exhibits to the petition which will include the complaint and other documents in their proper sequence according to how the exhibit sheets are labeled. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
May 7, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:24-cv-00203-LRH-CSD. (no image attached) (DLS)
May 7, 2024 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/7/2024. Defendants Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk aka Andrei Osichnuk, and Atakam Group Inc. removed this action to federal court on May 6, 2024. ECF No. 1. It was assigned to me the same day. However, under this District's Local Rules, "civil actions must be filed in the clerk's office for the unofficial division of the court in which the action allegedly arose." LR IA 1-8(a). Because this action commenced in the Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be transferred to the unofficial Northern Division of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada for all further proceedings.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
May 7, 2024 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/7/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/22/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
May 6, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (CAH)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, Case Number CV24-00492, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7675856) by Alexander Dekhtyar, Andrew Osichnuk aka Andrei Osichnuk, Atakam Group Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/16/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Calaway, Alexander) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Water Petroleum Corp. v. Atakam Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Andrew Osichnuk
Represented By: Chad F. Clement
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Christian Fife McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Atakam Group Inc.
Represented By: Chad F. Clement
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Christian Fife McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Blue Water Petroleum Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nevada Agency and Transfer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vladimir Ivanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Osichnuk
Represented By: Chad F. Clement
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Christian Fife McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Dekhtyar
Represented By: Chad F. Clement
Represented By: Alexander K. Calaway
Represented By: Christian Fife McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?