Mac Project LLC v. High Lonesome Claims et al
Plaintiff: Mac Project LLC
Defendant: High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Clay Sears, June Salisbury, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Michael S. Pasek, Steven L. Dobrescu, White Pine County, Phil Salisbury, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Richard W. Sears and Leslie A. Sears
Counter-Defendant: Pizz, Inc, Karla Sanchez, Kapacke Mining, Tracy Pizzaferato, Mac Mining Group, Inc, Kapacke Mining LLC, Kozi, LLC, Osceola Gold Inc and Mac Project LLC
Counter-Claimant: Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Camie Southam, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, Michael S. Pasek, High Lonesome Claims, Steven L. Dobrescu, Richard W. Sears, Dave Southam and Leslie A. Sears
Case Number: 3:2024cv00217
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2024 Filing 34 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Mac Project LLC. Adds new parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-18) (Wellman, Scott)
July 16, 2024 Filing 33 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, filed by Mac Mining Group, Inc( #23 Counterclaim), Mac Project LLC( #23 Counterclaim), Tracy Pizzaferato( #23 Counterclaim), Karla Sanchez( #25 Counterclaim).(Wellman, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2024 clarify (WJ).
July 5, 2024 Filing 32 OBJECTION to #30 appendix to REPLY to Response to #8 Motion for TRO by Defendants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Counter Claimants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Dave Southam. (Manuele, Shain) Modified on 7/8/2024 (WJ).
July 5, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE Corporte Disclosure Form by Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims( #25 Counterclaim), High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam. (Manuele, Shain)
July 1, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objection to Pasek Declaration, #2 Objection to Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KARLA SANCHEZ, #4 Declaration EVAN J. CHAMPA)(Wellman, Scott)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING VIDEO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - A video case management conference utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology is set before this Court on MONDAY, JULY 29, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to contact the Courtroom Administrator, Ashlyn Bye, at Ashlyn_Bye@nvd.uscourts.gov, by noon on WEDNESDAY, JULY 24, 2024, to provide the e-mail address of all counsel who will be attending the hearing. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report electronically on CM/ECF by 4:00 p.m. on WEDNESDAY, JULY 24, 2024. The parties shall file a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than WEDNESDAY, JULY 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/28/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 26, 2024 Filing 28 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of U.S. Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 25, 2024 Filing 27 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #26 Joinder,, #24 Response,, by Defendants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Counter Claimants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Dave Southam. (Manuele, Shain) Modified on 6/26/2024 #8 (WJ).
June 25, 2024 Filing 26 JOINDER to #24 Response,, by Defendants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Counter Claimants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Leslie A. Sears, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Dave Southam. (Manuele, Shain) Modified on 6/26/2024 #8 Motion (WJ).
June 25, 2024 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Mac Project LLC by Steven L. Dobrescu, Camie Southam, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, High Lonesome Claims, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Richard W. Sears, Leslie A. Sears, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Dave Southam, Teena K. Dubrescu. filed by Steven L. Dobrescu, Camie Southam, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, High Lonesome Claims, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Richard W. Sears, Leslie A. Sears, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Dave Southam, Teena K. Dubrescu.(Manuele, Shain)
June 25, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #8 Motion for TRO by Defendants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam, Counter Claimants Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Michael S. Pasek, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam. Replies due by 7/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion)(Manuele, Shain)
June 25, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/5/2024., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/9/2024.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Camie Southam, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, Michael S. Pasek, High Lonesome Claims, Steven L. Dobrescu, Richard W. Sears, Dave Southam, Leslie A. Sears. filed by Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Camie Southam, High Lonesome Mining, Inc, Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, Michael S. Pasek, High Lonesome Claims, Steven L. Dobrescu, Richard W. Sears, Dave Southam, Leslie A. Sears.(Manuele, Shain) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 20, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Wellman, Scott)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Counsel's Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/17/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 14, 2024 Filing 20 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Counsel's Confidential Information by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley) (other) (presiding)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting ECF No. #17 STIPULATION for Briefing Schedule re ECF No. #8 Motion for TRO. Responses due by 6/25/2024. Replies due by 7/1/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
June 13, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael S. Pasek. (DLS)
June 12, 2024 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Briefing Schedule re #8 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley) (other) (presiding)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Wellman for MAC Project LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley S. Slighting. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/12/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
June 12, 2024 Filing 15 ERRATA to #8 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Slighting, Bradley)
June 12, 2024 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Slighting, Bradley)
June 11, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Scott Wellman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley S. Slighting (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7714886) by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slighting, Bradley)
June 10, 2024 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/10/2024. Three days ago, Plaintiffs filed an emergency motion for a temporary restraining order. (ECF No. #8 ("Motion").) Given the nature of the case and the fact that Defendants have not yet been served, the Court declines to treat the Motion as an emergency and will instead follow the usual briefing schedule; however, the Court will review the Motion on an expedited basis once it is fully briefed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GIVM)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKETING ERROR - WRONG CASE - DISREGARD THIS ENTRY : ORDER - Clerk of the Court shall SEND Hurtado the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-inmate. (Form mailed 6/10/2024.) FURTHER ORDERED that on or before Friday, August 9, 2024, Hurtado will either: (1) pay the full $405 filing fee for a civil action; or (2) file with the Court a completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Non-Inmate on this Court's approved form, along with a completed and signed financial affidavit. The Court will retain Hurtado's civil rights complaint, (ECF No. #3 -1), but will not file it unless and until Hurtado timely complies with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/10/2024) (DRM). Modified on 6/10/2024 to denote DOCKETING ERROR. NEF REGENERATED. (DRM). Modified on 6/10/2024 (DRM).
June 10, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 -1 Summons Issued : Incorrect image was originally attached at ECF No. #9 -1. Image has been replaced; and NEF regenerated. (Service of corrected image is also attached hereto.) (DRM)
June 10, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to High Lonesome Mining, Inc, White Pine County re ECF Nos. #6 , #7 Proposed summons. (Attachments: #1 White Pine County) (DRM) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/10/2024) (DRM).
June 7, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. Responses due by 6/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judical Notice, #2 Index OF EXHIBITS)(Slighting, Bradley)
June 7, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Slighting, Bradley)
June 7, 2024 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Mac Project LLC. (Slighting, Bradley)
May 30, 2024 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:24-cv-00217-MMD-CSD. (no image attached) (DRM)
May 25, 2024 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mac Project LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Slighting, Bradley)
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kellie Ann Dobrescu, Nikolai L. Dobrescu, Steven L. Dobrescu, Teena K. Dubrescu, High Lonesome Claims, Leslie A. Sears, Richard W. Sears, Camie Southam, Dave Southam. (Attachments: #1 As to Richard W. Sears - address redacted, #2 As to High Lonesome Claims, #3 As to Leslie A. Sears - address redacted, #4 As to Nilolai L. Dobrescu, #5 As to Kellie Ann Dobrescu, #6 As to Steven L. Dobrescu, #7 As to Teena K. Debrescu, #8 As to Dave Southam) (GA) Modified on 6/17/2024 to reflect addresses for Richard W. Sears and Leslie Sears redacted (HJ).
May 20, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (GA)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7692461) by MAC PROJECT LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/30/2024. Proof of service due by 8/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Slighting, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/17/2024 per Stipulation and Order - ECF No. 20 and 21) (HJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mac Project LLC v. High Lonesome Claims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Lonesome Mining, Inc
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clay Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camie Southam
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Southam
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Pasek
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Dobrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Pine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolai L. Dobrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teena K. Dubrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Lonesome Claims
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Ann Dobrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Sears
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie A. Sears
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Pizz, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Karla Sanchez
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Kapacke Mining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Tracy Pizzaferato
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Mac Mining Group, Inc
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Kapacke Mining LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Kozi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Osceola Gold Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Mac Project LLC
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mac Project LLC
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Represented By: Bradley S Slighting
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Nikolai L. Dobrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Camie Southam
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: High Lonesome Mining, Inc
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Kellie Ann Dobrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Teena K. Dubrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Michael S. Pasek
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: High Lonesome Claims
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Steven L. Dobrescu
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Richard W. Sears
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Dave Southam
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Leslie A. Sears
Represented By: Shain Gregory Manuele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?