Drummond v. Breitenbach et al
Petitioner: Bradley Drummond
Respondent: Warden Breitenbach and The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2024cv00504
Filed: November 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Bradley Drummond. (Filed and granted per #5 Order.)(DRM)
December 30, 2024 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bradley Drummond. (Filed per #5 Order. E-service to FPD; AG.) (DRM)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The IFP Application (ECF No. #4 ) is granted. Clerk is directed to separately file the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. #1 -1) and the Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -2). The Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -2) is granted. The FPD is appointed to represent the petitioner. Clerk is directed to electronically serve upon the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. #1 -1). (E-service 12/31/2024; petition upon subsequent filing.) FPD will have 30 days from the date of this Order (1/29/2025) to file a notice of appearance or to indicate to the Court their inability to represent the petitioner in this case. Clerk is directed to add AG, as counsel for Respondents and to provide Respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the AG only. (NEFs # 1-4 regenerated to AG only on 12/31/2024.) Respondents will have 30 days from the date of this order (1/29/2025) to appear in this action. Respondents will not be required to respond to the habeas petition at this time. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 12/30/2024. (For Distribution by law library.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 5, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Bradley Drummond. (DRM)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is therefore ordered that Petitioner will have until Monday, December 30, 2024, to pay the $5 filing fee or file a new, complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Petitioner two copies of the form for a state prisoner to apply to proceed in forma pauperis. (Sent on 11/13/2024). Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 11/13/2024. (For Distribution by law library.) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form with Instructions, #2 2nd Copy of IFP Form with Instructions per Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
November 7, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Breitenbach, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:24-cv-00504-ART-CLB. (For Distribution by law library.) (DLS)
November 7, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Bradley Drummond. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel)(DLS)
November 7, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (DLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drummond v. Breitenbach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Breitenbach
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bradley Drummond
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?