Hometown Health Plan, Inc. et al v. Gateway Health Partners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc. and Hometown Health Plan, Inc.
Defendant: Gateway Health Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00581
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig S Denney
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation. Gateway Health Partners, Inc. answer due 3/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 1/8/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 8, 2025 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Plaintiffs Hometown Health Plan, Inc., Hometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc.. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam) (extend) (answer)
January 3, 2025 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hometown Health Plan, Inc., Hometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent hometown health management company for Hometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc.; Corporate Parent Renown Health for Hometown Health Plan, Inc. added. (Hosmer-Henner, Adam)
December 27, 2024 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by ometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc., Hometown Health Plan, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/3/2025. (no image attached) (JQC)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 17, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gateway Health Partners, Inc.. (DRM)
December 17, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gateway Health Partners, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7899610) by Hometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc., Hometown Health Plan, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/26/2024. Proof of service due by 3/16/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Hosmer-Henner, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hometown Health Plan, Inc. et al v. Gateway Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown Health Providers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Katrina Weil
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Katrina Weil
Represented By: Adam Hosmer-Henner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?