D'elia-Laskin v. Affinia Default Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kellie D'elia-Laskin
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC and Nationstar Mortgage LLC Attorney for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper (erroneously sued as Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper) doing business as Mr Cooper
Case Number: 3:2025cv00050
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2025 Filing 14 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Cheong, Holly)
March 18, 2025 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/2025. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #12 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 17, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 3/31/2025. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Cheong, Holly)
March 11, 2025 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Amy Lemus of Non-Monetary Status to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Foreclosure Trustee Pursuant to NRS 107.029, by Defendant Affinia Default Services, LLC. (DRM)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Stipulation to Extend Time : Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer/response to Complaint due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/27/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 26, 2025 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) (Plaintiff's Complaint) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Cheong, Holly) (extend) (answer)
February 24, 2025 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Cheong, Holly)
February 7, 2025 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Cheong, Holly)
January 30, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 to Extend Time (First Request) re: #1 Petition for Removal. Response/Answer is due by 3/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/30/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) (Plaintiff's Complaint) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2025. (Cheong, Holly) (answer)
January 24, 2025 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/24/2025. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/8/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/23/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 23, 2025 Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (GA)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cheong, Holly)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Washoe County District Court, Case Number CV24-02483, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7933950) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Proof of service due by 3/10/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cheong, Holly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'elia-Laskin v. Affinia Default Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie D'elia-Laskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey H. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC Attorney for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper (erroneously sued as Nationstar Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper) doing business as Mr Cooper
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?