Garcia v. Tafelmeyer et al
Plaintiff: Joey A. Garcia
Defendant: Jeremy Tafelmeyer and Bell Levi
Case Number: 3:2025cv00051
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Anne R Traum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered without prejudice per ECF #7 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/5/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
March 5, 2025 Filing 8 COMPLAINT by Joey A. Garcia. Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice but without leave to amend in this action. (GA)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the Clerk of the Court update Plaintiff's address pursuant to his filing at ECF No. 6: Joey Garcia, #93047, N.N.C.C., P.O. Box 7000, Carson City, Nevada 89702. It is further ordered that Judge Baldwin's R&R (ECF No. #3 ) is ADOPTED in accordance with this order. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs IFP application (ECF No. 1) is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ordered that the Clerk FILE the complaint (ECF No. 1-1). It is further ordered that the complaint (ECF No. 1-1) is DISMISSED without prejudice but without leave to amend in this action. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/5/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
February 14, 2025 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Joey A. Garcia. Response to Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2025. (Submission also docketed in 3:25-cv-00038 as number noted on document.)(DRM)
February 10, 2025 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 2/10/2025. The Magistrate Judge has issued a report and recommendation in this case. (ECF No. #3 .) Since then, Plaintiff's mail has been returned as undeliverable. (ECF No. #4 .) Plaintiff shall have until February 17, 2025 to provide the Court with an updated address. Plaintiff shall also have until March 3, 2025 to object to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation, if they wish to do so. The Clerk of the Court is directed to email a copy of ECF Nos. 3, 4, and 5 to the Northern Nevada Correctional Center Law Librarian, prisoner number 93047. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KGW)
February 7, 2025 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Report and Recommendation, addressed to Joey A. Garcia at Lyon County Jail. (DRM)
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS THEREFORE RECOMMENDED that Garcia's application to proceed in forma pauperis, (ECF No. #1 ), be GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Garcia not be required to pay an initial installment fee. Nevertheless, the full filing fee should still be due, even if this action is dismissed or is otherwise unsuccessful, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, as amended by the Prison Litigation Reform Act. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Nevada Department of Corrections pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to the account of JOEY A. GARCIA, #93047 (in months that the account exceeds $10.00) until the full $350.00 filing fee has been paid for this action. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Clerk FILE the complaint, (ECF No. #1 -1). IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the complaint, (ECF No. #1 -1), be DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that this action be CLOSED, and judgment be entered accordingly. Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/28/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Joey A. Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(GA)
January 23, 2025 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (GA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Tafelmeyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey A. Garcia
Represented By: Law Library - Northern NV CC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Tafelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?