Bui v. Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart et al
Plaintiff: Huong Bui
Defendant: Matthew Millis, Jason Stroberg, Sarah Ricketts, Anastasia Montanez and Copart of Arizona, Inc. doing business as Copart Dealer Services doing business as Copart Direct doing business as Copart
Case Number: 3:2025cv00102
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - The Court has reviewed the joint case management report, (ECF No. #14 ), and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the Court's standing order. (ECF No. #10 .) IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/17/2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KM)
April 17, 2025 Filing 14 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendants Jason Stroberg, Sarah Ricketts, Anastasia Montanez, Copart of Arizona, Inc., Matthew Millis, Plaintiff Huong Bui. (John, Philip)
March 21, 2025 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jason Stroberg, Sarah Ricketts, Anastasia Montanez, Copart of Arizona, Inc., Matthew Millis, Plaintiff Huong Bui. (Bradley, Regina)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER adopting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/19/2025. Motions due by 9/18/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/12/2025. NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form has been sent to parties not receiving electronic service.)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than Friday, April 25, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/11/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
March 11, 2025 Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
March 11, 2025 Filing 9 First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Huong Bui. (Bradley, Regina)
March 6, 2025 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Huong Bui. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bradley, Regina)
March 4, 2025 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Jason Stroberg, Sarah Ricketts, Anastasia Montanez, Copart of Arizona, Inc., Matthew Millis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(John, Philip)
March 3, 2025 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Stroberg, Sarah Ricketts, Anastasia Montanez, Copart of Arizona, Inc., Matthew Millis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (John, Philip)
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Defendants. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/10/2025. (no image attached) (HAM)
February 21, 2025 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2025. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/8/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/23/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to LR IA 1-6 and LR IA 1-8 this case was improperly opened in the unofficial southern division of the District of Nevada. This case is being transferred to the unofficial northern division of the District of Nevada and assign case number 3:25-cv-000102. All future filings are to be made in the Northern Division. This case is closed. (WJ)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV24-02325, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7962099) by Jason Stroberg, Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart, Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart Direct, Matthew Millis, Anastasia Montanez, Sarah Ricketts, Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart Dealer Services. Proof of service due by 1/8/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (John, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 20, 2025 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bui v. Copart of Arizona, Inc. dba Copart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huong Bui
Represented By: Regina M. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Millis
Represented By: Philip A. John
Represented By: Regina M. Bradley
Represented By: Krystina Butchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stroberg
Represented By: Philip A. John
Represented By: Regina M. Bradley
Represented By: Krystina Butchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Ricketts
Represented By: Philip A. John
Represented By: Regina M. Bradley
Represented By: Krystina Butchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastasia Montanez
Represented By: Philip A. John
Represented By: Regina M. Bradley
Represented By: Krystina Butchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copart of Arizona, Inc. doing business as Copart Dealer Services doing business as Copart Direct doing business as Copart
Represented By: Regina M. Bradley
Represented By: Philip A. John
Represented By: Krystina Butchart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?