Chambers v. NH State Prison Medical Department et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv00219
Filed: July 5, 2005
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2005 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 8 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jar, )
July 12, 2005 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, recommending that it be denied. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 8/1/2005. Signed by Judge James R. Muirhead. (jar, )
July 5, 2005 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Randolph Chambers, initial fee of $8.51. No further action by court until initial fee paid. Failure to pay will result in dismissal. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Fee due 8/5/2005. (jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. NH State Prison Medical Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?