US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Patel et al
Plaintiff: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Piyush G. Patel, David J. Kirkpatrick, Eric Jaeger, Bruce D. Kay, Robert J. Gagalis, Robert G. Barber, Jr., Lawrence Collins, Michael A. Skubisz, Jerry A. Shanahan and Hor Chong Boey
Case Number: 1:2007cv00039
Filed: February 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
County: Belknap
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting in part 361 the SEC's motion for default judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER denying 354 Motion for Default Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ///ORDER re: INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT JERRY SHANAHAN. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(vln)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER denying without prejudice 258 and 278 motions for summary judgment. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) Modified on 9/26/2012 to remove slashes (vln).
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying 224 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 248 Motion to Strike 234 Response to Motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jab)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ///ORDER of FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT PIYUSH G. PATEL. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 157 , 158 , 159 , 160 , 162 motions to dismiss; and, granting in part and denying in part 165 motion for judgment on the pleadings. So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lag)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER 150 Amended Complaint ( Special Hearing To Review Claims Against Defendants set for 8/18/2009 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.) Signed by Chief Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (vln) Modified on 7/13/2009 to correct spelling (vln).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piyush G. Patel
Represented By: John Richard Baraniak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Lucy J. Karl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Jaeger
Represented By: Peter A. Spaeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Kay
Represented By: Bruce A. Singal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Gagalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Barber, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Collins
Represented By: Kevin E. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Skubisz
Represented By: Ann Pauly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry A. Shanahan
Represented By: Andrew Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hor Chong Boey
Represented By: Willliam Cintolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: James A. Scoggins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?