Evans v. NH State Prison, Warden

Petitioner: Chad Evans
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Case Number: 1:2008cv00105
Filed: March 20, 2008
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
County: Merrimack
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Referring Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (cmp)
June 2, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 16 Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 22 Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied. Evans may move for a certificate of appealability by 6/16/10; warden to respond within 10 days after date motion is filed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
May 19, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Warden to refile answer in accordance with this order. (Answer due by 6/1/2010.) Signed by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
March 3, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Clarify - Warden has not complied with court's order of 1/20/10. Warden to file answer or otherwise plead on or before 3/10/10. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (dae)
January 20, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 13 Order, and 14 Petitioner's Response to Order. This Order, Petition and Documents 13 and 14 to be served upon Respondent Gerry in accordance with Agreement on Acceptance of Service; answer due within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)
December 14, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; petitioner's petition remains mixed at this time. Pleadings in this action must be filed and signed by counsel of record. Any pleading not conforming to LR 4.3(e) shall not be docketed or presented to a judicial office and will instead be returned to the filer. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 1/13/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Muirhead. (dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. NH State Prison, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Woodcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chad Evans
Represented By: David M. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?