Green Tree Servicing, LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Defendant: United States of America, Dana E. Ricker and Kristi L. Ricker
Case Number: 1:2009cv00191
Filed: June 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
County: Strafford
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration re 18 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and/or for leave to file for summary judgment. The case is scheduled for a final pretrial conference on October 11, 2011 at 10:30 a.m., bench trial is scheduled for October 17, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. and the parties' final pretrial filings are due accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Green Tree Servicing, LLC. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving 8 Discovery Plan (with changes). Length of Trial 1 day. Case Track: standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/15/2010. (cmp)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROCEDURAL ORDER re: Pretrial Conference set for March 10, 2010 at 10am. Signed by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (cmp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing, LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Julie C. Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana E. Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi L. Ricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?