USA v. Washington et al
Case Number: 1:2010cv00039
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Release of Funds. Clerk to disburse monies as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ///ORDER granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Defendants Bank of America and The Bank of New York, Mellon Trust Company, N.A. The clerk shall enter final judgment on the government's claim against the Banks. The government's claim against the Washingtons shall remain stayed as outlined. The government and the Washingtons to file a joint report as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SIGNED ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS re: 60 Motion to Deposit Funds. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Discharging Liens re: 58 Proposed Consent Decree. In reference to property identified as 6 Autumn Lane, Londonderry, NH. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 51 Status Report and 52 Status Report. Stay lifted as to the claim of the United States against defendants Bank of America, Bank of New York and Mellon Trust Company only. Stay remains as to claims of the US against the Washingtons. Joint proposed scheduling order (as outlined) to be filed by June 30, 2012. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) Modified on 6/1/2012 to add: Stay remains text.(dae).
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Motion to Dismiss to being reinstated on request if necessary and appropriate after the stay is lifted. Case is stayed. Status Reports due every 120 days. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (dae)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?