USA v. Radkay et al
Case Number: 1:2010cv00065
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Muirhead
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER/ APPROVED AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mxm)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty recused - Nancy J. Smith, Esq. is counsel of record for NH DOC and is on the judge's recusal list. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER approving with amendments 18 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 day. Case Track: Expedited. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Ready for Trial on 3/31/2011. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/25/2011. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/1/2010. (kad)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Radkay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?