Sensor Systems Support, Inc. v. Federal Aviation Administration
Plaintiff: Sensor Systems Support, Inc.
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 1:2010cv00262
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna) Modified on 2/9/2012 to add: ///(mxm).
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ///ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sensor Systems Support, Inc. v. Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sensor Systems Support, Inc.
Represented By: G. Shepard Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?