St. Mary's Bank v. Visible Changes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Bank
Defendant: Citizens Bank New Hampshire, East Side Realty Trust, Five Point Capital, Inc., Daniel Lombardo, Marlin Leasing, State of New Hampshire, United States of America and Visible Changes, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00303
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Release of Funds. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROCEDURAL ORDER 24 Motion for Release of Funds. Defendants are hereby ordered to show cause why this court should not dismiss defendants Five Point Capital, Inc., and Marlin Leasing for lack of proper service of process. Writ ten submissions to this court shall be filed no later than December 6, 2010, and shall address the effect, if any, that dismissal would have on approval of the final distribution proposal in Doc. No. 24. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Transfer Funds. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Motion for Release of Funds in the amount of $26,547.30. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for for Release of Plaintiff St. Mary's Bank From Case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (kad)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Mary's Bank v. Visible Changes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank New Hampshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Side Realty Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Point Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Leasing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Hampshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Julie C. Avetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visible Changes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?