Federal National Mortgage Association v. Morris et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Ledgewood Hills Condominium Association, Thomas F. Morris and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2010cv00412
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REVISED ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. As he was preparing to disburse the funds in this case, the Clerk of Court raised a concern with the Court about the Order of disbursement dated February 15, 2011 (doc. no. 17). Specifically, the Clerk is concerned about the phrase "plus statutory interest from January 10, 2011" that appears on page 3, paragraph A, line 1. There is no basis to award statutory interest in this case. As a result, the Court intends to strike this language from its Order. To t he extent any party objects, that party shall notify the Court in writing on or before March 23, 2011. If no party objects, the Court will issue an amended order striking the language. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ///ORDER granting 16 Motion for Default Judgment as to Thomas F. Morris. Judgment for FNMA in the amount of $1559.00, for Ledgewood in the amount of $19,786.11, and for the United States in the amount of $109,0 50,94, plus statutory interest from January 10, 2011. Default judgment is entered against Morris with respect to the claims of FNMA, Ledgewood, and the United States. Morris is awarded a judgment as to the balance of the funds deposited with the clerk, after payment of the amounts set forth in paragraph A. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (kad) Modified on 2/16/2011 to add: "///"(kad).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 13 Partially Assented to Motion for Default Judgment and for Judgment on Interpleader Claims. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (amm)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Funds are to be accepted by the Clerk and deposited into the Registry of the Court until further notice,IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk:1. Cause the funds to be invested in the Court Registry Investment Syste m;2. Deduct a registry fee equal to ten percent (10%) of the interest earned on said funds pursuant to the directive of the Judicial Conference of the United States; and3. Deduct the registry fee prior to the disbursement of funds without further order of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (ko)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Morris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Charles W. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ledgewood Hills Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Karen Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?