USA v. Filip et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Southern New Hampshire Bank and Trust Company, NH Department of Revenue Administration, David J. Filip, MDF Properties, LLC and Dyck-O'Neal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00283
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 54(b) So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER/Final Judgment pursuant to FED.R.CIV. P. 54(b) So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER approving 30 Discovery Plan. ; terminating 31 Discovery Plan.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/16/2012. Mediation Status Report Follow Up on 1/9/2012. (mxm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Filip et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern New Hampshire Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Martha Van Oot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Revenue Administration
Represented By: Karen A. Schlitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Filip
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDF Properties, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyck-O'Neal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Nathan L. Strup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?