Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee for Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust, 2006-5 v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00106
Filed: March 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving as outlined 12 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Joint Motion to supplement discovery plan to be filed by June 28, 2012. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/15/2012. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 8/15/2012. Mediation Follow Up on 9/17/2012.(dae)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 09cv385-LM reassigned to Judge DiClerico. Declaratory judgment action, 12cv106-JD will proceed first, followed by the quiet title action, 12cv68-JD which will be stayed until the declaratory judgment is concluded. During that time, 09cv385-JD will remain stayed. When quiet title action is resolved, Deutsche Bank to file status report in 09cv385-JD. Pretrial to be scheduled in 12cv106-JD. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee for Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust, 2006-5 v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Edmond J. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Peter G. Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?