Bosonetto et al v. Richmond et al

Plaintiff: Jill Bosonetto and Nicolas Bosonetto
Defendant: Sandra Gillis and Richmond, Town of
Case Number: 1:2012cv00277
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Alter or Amend 34 Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ///ORDER granting 24 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendants have conclusively shown that the res judicata effect of the state-court decisions bars the Bosonettos' claims in this action. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall make proper service on or before December 14, 2012, or defendant Sean McElhiney will be dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Defendants Sandra Gillis and Town of Richmond shall file their response to the amended complaint within fourteen days of the date of this order. Plaintiffs shall serve Sean McElhiney with the amended complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, within twenty-one days of the date of this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosonetto et al v. Richmond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Gillis
Represented By: Joseph S. Hoppock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond, Town of
Represented By: Joseph S. Hoppock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Bosonetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Bosonetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?