Posteraro v. Citizens Financial Group et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Posteraro
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group and Christos Hatzidakis
Case Number: 1:2013cv00416
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MODIFIED MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Certain findings contained in this order were modified in the court's order on the plaintiff's motion for reconsideratio n (Order, January 25, 2016, document no. 82). The court's ruling on the motion for summary judgment remained unchanged. Motion granted as to Counts 1-4, 7 and 8. Motion denied as to Counts 5 and 6. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 43 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony re PTSD; granting 44 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Lost Wages/Benefits; granting 45 Motion in Limine to Limit Evidence of Damages after 1/20/14; deny ing 46 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence from Hatzidakis Personnel File; granting 47 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence re Todisco; granting 49 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Other Litigation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion granted as to Counts 1-4, 7 and 8. Motion denied as to Counts 5 and 6. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Posteraro v. Citizens Financial Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christos Hatzidakis
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Posteraro
Represented By: Stephen A. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?