Pukt et al v. Nexgrill Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara Pukt and Joseph Pukt
Defendant: Nexgrill Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00215
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying 78 Motion to Exclude; denying 81 Motion to Exclude to the extent the evidence is offered to show notice of a defect and is otherwise granted; granting 82 Motion to Exclude. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re: sealed documents/Objections 131 , 132 and 133 . Court will vacate its order dated 7/7/16 re: sealing; objections and exhibits will be unsealed on 8/29 unless a further response from defendant persuades the court otherwise before then. Response deadline set for 8/29/2016. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting in part 71 Motion for Leave to Amend the 1 Complaint. Motion is granted, except for the remedy of punitive damages. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2016). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Exclude; denying 48 Motion to Exclude; granting in part 61 Motion to Strike 52 Reply to Objection to Motion. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pukt et al v. Nexgrill Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgrill Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Pukt
Represented By: Raymond E. Mack
Represented By: Joseph Gardner Mattson
Represented By: Joseph L. McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pukt
Represented By: Raymond E. Mack
Represented By: Joseph Gardner Mattson
Represented By: Joseph L. McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?