Moulton v. Bane et al

Defendant: David Bane and Prime Choice Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Moulton
Case Number: 1:2014cv00265
Filed: June 12, 2014
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2016 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 151 Motion for Attorney Fees. Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and doc. nos. 150 , 109 , 95 , and 28 . So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
March 21, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER: Defendants' motion under Rule 52(c) to dismiss CPA claim is denied. Court finds and rules in favor of Moulton as outlined; Total damages awarded $227,868.18. Moulton entitled to an award of the costs of the suit, including attorneys' fees. Motion due by 4/11/16; response due within 14 days from date motion is filed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
December 2, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Sanctions. Motions are granted to the extent that plaintiff is awarded reasonable attorneys fees in the amount of $1,620.00. The motions are otherwise denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
November 24, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $2854 in fees. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
November 16, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. No current basis for defendants' request for injunctive relief, as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
November 3, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against Eric Emery are resolved in his favor. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
November 24, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Count III for Failure to State a Claim. The conversion claim, Count III in the third-party complaint against King's Highway Realty Trust is dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moulton v. Bane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Choice Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Moulton
Represented By: Michele E. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?