Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC v. Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC
Defendant: Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A. and Karen S. McGinley
Case Number: 1:2014cv00303
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Exclude Hochman Report; denying 67 Motion to Exclude Levine Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion in Limine re Four Types of Evidence and Argument Identified; granting in par t and denying in part 94 Motion to Exclude Evidence of 2001 and Older Regulatory Materials; granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Exclude Evidence and Questioning re Unproven Allegations; denying without prejudice 96 Motion for Con tempt and/or to Exclude McAdam's Testimony; denying 123 Motion to Compel Evidentiary Support for Damage Claims; denying 124 Motion to Continue Trial; denying 131 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Concerning Pre-and-post closing Events. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CORRECTED ORDER denying 37 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Amended Complaint. The court unseals documents as outlined. The parties to proceed on discovery issues as outlined. (Corrected to include additional documents to unseal). So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Compel to Produce. Defendants to submit documents outlined to the court for in camera review on or before July 17, 2015. The remainder of plaintiff's motion is denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC v. Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devine, Millimet & Branch, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen S. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwood Select Asset Fund XI, (6)-1, LLC
Represented By: Williams Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?