New Hampshire Hospital Association et al v. US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary et al
Plaintiff: LRGHealthcare, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, New Hampshire Hospital Association, Speare Memorial Hospital and Valley Regional Hospital, Inc.
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator and US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary
Case Number: 1:2015cv00460
Filed: November 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Attorney Fees. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 64 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 69 Motion for Modification or Clarification of March 2017 Permanent Injunction. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 53 Motion to Amend 52 Judgment, denying as moot 54 Motion to File Amicus Brief. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 46 Motion to Intervene; denying 50 Motion to Strike. Plainti ffs motion for summary judgment (doc. no. 33 ) is granted as to Counts I and II and denied as to Count III. Defendants motion for summary judgment (doc. no. 35 ) is granted as to Count III but denied as to Counts I and II. Count IV is voluntarily dismissed. Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hampshire Hospital Association et al v. US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: James C. Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator
Represented By: James C. Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary
Represented By: James C. Luh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LRGHealthcare
Represented By: Holly J. Barcroft
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Holly J. Barcroft
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire Hospital Association
Represented By: Holly J. Barcroft
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Speare Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Holly J. Barcroft
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Regional Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Holly J. Barcroft
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Gordon J. MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?