Wallis v. HCC Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Warren Wallis
Defendant: HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC and HCC Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00525
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Filing 25 Letter to Attorney Pandolph from Deputy Clerk re: return of discovery material. (jbw)
March 13, 2017 Filing 24 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #23 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (jbw)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 THIS ENTRY REPLACES DOCUMENT NO. #22 . Page 1, paragraph 1, line 5, changed State. to Stat. ///ORDER granting #12 HCC Life's Motion for Summary Judgment as to both counterclaims. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT NO. #23 . ///ORDER granting #12 HCC Life's Motion for Summary Judgment as to both counterclaims. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) Modified on 3/3/2017 to correct page 1, paragraph 1, line 5. Changed State. to Stat. (lat).
February 15, 2017 Filing 21 Addendum/Conventionally filed disc re: phone recording re: #20 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion by HCC Life Insurance Company. (jbw)
February 13, 2017 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HCC Life Insurance Company. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Nathan Harris, #2 Attachment to Exhibit 4/29/14 Call Transcript, #3 Exhibit (Affidavit) Lori Long, #4 Exhibit E (Phone Records))(Pandolph, William)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF.) Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/15/2017.(jbw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum filed by HCC Life Insurance Company. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Nathan Harris, #3 Exhibit (Affidavit) Lori Long, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E -- Phone Records)(Pandolph, William)
January 21, 2017 RESCHEDULED: TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 4/14/2017. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 4/28/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Bench Trial set for two week period beginning Tuesday, 5/16/2017 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jbw) Modified on 1/23/2017 to correct type of trial to bench. (jbw).
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 joint assented-to Motion to Continue Trial and final pretrial conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat)
January 20, 2017 Filing 18 Joint Assented to MOTION to Continue Trial and Final Pretrial Conference filed by HCC Life Insurance Company.(Pandolph, William)
December 16, 2016 Filing 17 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HCC Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Excerpts of Warren Wallis' Deposition)(Pandolph, William)
December 16, 2016 Filing 16 Joint Mediation Statement: Mediation not Appropriate (Pandolph, William)
December 2, 2016 Clerk's Notice - No Mediation Statement Filed. According to the parties' discovery plan, a mediation statement was due to be filed by 12/1/2016. The parties are directed to file their mediation statement within 14 days of this notice. Mediation Follow Up on 12/16/2016. The deadline DOES NOT consider the three additional days for mail service that may be applicable to certain parties under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d) and Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).(jbw)
November 29, 2016 Filing 15 Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Follow up on Reply on 12/16/2016.(Pandolph, William)
November 29, 2016 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment Replaces Document No. 13 filed by Warren Wallis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A - Wallis Deposition, #3 Exhibit B - Case Law)(Bonnette, Steve)
November 28, 2016 NOTICE of ECF Filing Errors re: #13 Objection to Motion filed by Warren Wallis. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. Filer shall refile and add to docket text Replaces document no. 13. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1587. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 12/8/2016.(jbw)
November 28, 2016 Filing 13 REFILED. See corrected filing, document no. 14. OBJECTION to #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Wallis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bonnette, Steve) Modified on 11/29/2016 to refiling language to the docket text. (jbw).
November 1, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HCC Life Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 12/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A - Application, #3 Exhibit B - Policy, #4 Exhibit C - Medical Records, #5 Exhibit D - Medical Records, #6 Excerpts of Warren Wallis Deposition, #7 Excerpts of Jonathan Gomberg, MD Deposition, #8 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Jonathan Alexander, MD, FACP, FACC, #9 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Marcus Such, #10 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Jon Padgett)(Pandolph, William).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment from October 25, 2016 to November 1, 2016. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/1/2016.(jbw)
October 20, 2016 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment from October 25, 2016 to November 1, 2016 filed by HCC Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Pandolph, William)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting with modifications #10 Motion to Extend Time discovery deadlines, etc. Text of Order: Granted with the following modifications: The deadline for the close of discovery is set for October 17, 2016 and summary judgment motions, if any, shall be filed no later than October 25, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery deadline 10/17/2016. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/25/2016.(dae)
August 10, 2016 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Extend Defendant's Expert Disclosure from July 1, 2016 to September 30, 2016, for the Completion of Discovery from September 1, 2016 to October 15, 2016, and for the Filing of Motions for Summary Judgment from September 15, 2016 to October 31, 2016 filed by HCC Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Pandolph, William)
May 31, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steve J. Bonnette on behalf of Warren Wallis(Bonnette, Steve)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order /// ENDORSED ORDER approving #8 Stipulation re: Substitution of Party. Text of Order: Stipulation approved; so ordered. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw)
April 1, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION re: Substitution of Party by HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC(Pandolph, William)
February 2, 2016 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 1/20/2017. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/3/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 02:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Bench Trial set for the two-week period beginning 2/22/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (jbw)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1-2 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 2/22/2017. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.Discovery deadline 9/1/2016. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/15/2016. Mediation Follow Up on 12/1/2016.(jbw)
February 2, 2016 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC. (Pandolph, William)
January 27, 2016 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 213-2015-CV-00233, Cheshire County Superior Court(Pandolph, William)
January 26, 2016 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Reply to Counterclaim filed by Warren Wallis. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1587.(jbw)
January 25, 2016 Filing 5 REPLY to Counterclaim re #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Warren Wallis.(Bonnette, Steve)
January 16, 2016 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/11/2016. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jbw)
January 15, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Warren Wallis filed by HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC.(Pandolph, William)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to January 15, 2016. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jbw)
January 6, 2016 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 15, 2016 filed by HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC.(Pandolph, William)
January 4, 2016 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de)
December 31, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:15-cv-525-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (de)
December 31, 2015 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Pandolph, William)
December 31, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cheshire County Superior Court, case number 213-2015-CV-00233 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1316919) filed by HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC. State Court Record Follow Up 1/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Compliance, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pandolph, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallis v. HCC Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Medical Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Wallis
Represented By: Steve J. Bonnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?