Bulpitt et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn L. Bulpitt and Gary D. Bulpitt
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee
Case Number: 1:2016cv00399
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ///ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. All of plaintiffs' claims are dismissed. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 23 Motion for Reconsideration re: 22 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration re: 22 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Motion for Reconsideration re: 22 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 35 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law; granting 25 Motion to Amend 1 Notice of Removal. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2017.) The Final Pretrial scheduled for 9/21/17 is cancelled. The Trial scheduled for 10/3/17 is continued and will be rescheduled, if necessary, after the defendant's dispositive motion is resolved. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ///ORDER granting in part 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. The defendants motion is granted on Counts I and II. The only claim remaining in the case is Count III, which is limited to the claim that the defendants violated Regulation X, § 1024.41(f)(2) and § 1024.41(g). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulpitt et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn L. Bulpitt
Represented By: William C. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary D. Bulpitt
Represented By: William C. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?