Colligan v. Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital et al
Plaintiff: R. Lacey Colligan
Defendant: Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic and Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 1:2016cv00513
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff's Medical Expert from Testifying About Human Resources' Standards and Practices. The motion is granted only as to Dr. Pitman's characterization of Dartmouth-Hitchcock's practices as "deplorable". The motion is otherwise denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ///ORDER denying 56 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration re: 55 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ///ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court grants the motion as to Counts I-II, V-VI, and VIII-X. The court denied the motion as to Counts III, IV, and VII. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 52 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part 22 Motion to Exclude. Motion is granted to the extent that a sanction is ordered against the defendant as outlined in this order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colligan v. Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Lacey Colligan
Represented By: William E. Christie
Represented By: Timothy John McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartmouth Hitchcock Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?