State of New Hampshire v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al Featured Case

The State of New Hampshire alleged that Defendant Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc. and The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. had improperly and fraudulently promoted its opioid pain medications for treating chronic pain. Plaintiff seeks restitution and compensatory damages for the costs incurred in treating opioid-related abuse, addiction, overdoes, injury and death.

Plaintiff: NH, State of
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P. and The Purdue Frederick Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv00427
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2017 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Comply With Notice of Nonconforming Document Re: Defs' Motion to Seal Exhibit B to Notice of Removal to October 30, 2017 filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company.(Deane, W.)
September 27, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re 9 MOTION for Linda Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by NH, State of. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1(c) - No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 9. The document will remain on file. Please note that unle ss a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. Compliance Deadline set for 10/10/2017.(vln)
September 26, 2017 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer No Later Than 14 Days After Ruling Issued on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (vln)
September 26, 2017 9 MOTION for Linda Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1565242.) filed by NH, State of. Follow up on Objection on 10/10/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Singer)(Boffetti, James)
September 25, 2017 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by NH, State of. Follow up on Objection on 10/10/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Boffetti, James)
September 25, 2017 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James T. Boffetti on behalf of NH, State of (Boffetti, James)
September 21, 2017 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to a Date No Later Than 14 Days After Ruling Issued on Plaintiff's Anticipated Motion to Remand filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company.(Deane, W.)
September 19, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re 5 MOTION to Seal 4 EXHIBIT B filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File the concurrence statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 5. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Compliance Deadline set for 9/29/2017.(vln)
September 18, 2017 5 MOTION to Seal Document 4 EXHIBIT B - UNREDACTED COMPLAINT TO 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company. Follow up on Objection on 10/2/2017. (vln)
September 18, 2017 4 SEALED EXHIBIT B - UNREDACTED COMPLAINT TO 1 Notice of Removal, (SEALED at Level I) filed by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company(vln)
September 18, 2017 3 Disclosure Statement by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Deane, W.)
September 18, 2017 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website HERE. (mc)
September 18, 2017 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A. Vicinanzo on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. Attorney David A. Vicinanzo added to party Purdue Pharma Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Vicinanzo added to party Purdue Pharma L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Vicinanzo added to party The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.(pty:dft).(Vicinanzo, David)
September 15, 2017 NOTICE re 1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company shall file a disclosure statement by September 22, 2017. Disclosure Statement due 9/22/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
September 15, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-427-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 15, 2017 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Merrimack County Superior Court, NH, case number 217-2017-CV-00402 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1561627) filed by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P.. Answer Follow Up on 10/6/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/29/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: State Court Docket and Redacted Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B: Notice of Conventional Filing, # 3 Exhibit C: Notice of Removal to Counsel, # 4 Exhibit D: Notice of Removal to State Court, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Deane, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New Hampshire v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NH, State of
Represented By: James T. Boffetti
Represented By: Linda Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: David A. Vicinanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?