Davis et al v. Hatch et al

Plaintiff: Ada T. Ceglanski and Michael A. Davis
Defendant: Deborah Smith Hatch, Kenneth T. Rothwell and Western Maine Timberlands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00752
Filed: December 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Assented to Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Expert Disclosures. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
October 2, 2018 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines for Expert Disclosures filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Form 3)(Meier, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Assented to Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines Expert Disclosures. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
September 6, 2018 Motions terminated: #27 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to 09/01/2018 for Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis. Motion refiled. See doc. no. 28. (js)
September 6, 2018 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines Expert Disclosures Replaces document no. 27 filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Form 3)(Meier, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #27 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to 09/01/2018 for Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis. The document fails to comply with LR 7.2- Motion to extend shall state if requested extension would result in a continuance. Extension requests in a case must be accompanied by a completed Civil Form 3. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines.Filer shall refile and add in the docket text Replaces document no. 27.Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 9/6/2018.(js)
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 28. Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to 09/01/2018 for Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis.(Meier, Christopher) Modified on 9/6/2018 to add: Motion refiled(js).
June 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Defendants' DeBenedetto Disclosure Re:Codefendants by Deborah Smith Hatch.(Pribis, William)
June 15, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of DeBenedetto Parties by Western Maine Timberlands, Inc..(Hurley, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE 23 Joint Mediation Statement. Text of Order: "The parties have filed their Joint Mediation Statement, (Doc. no. 23), which included a "Joint Notice of Selected Mediators." The parties proposed names of potential mediators who are not included on the court's list of approved panel mediators. Accordingly, doc. no. 23 is stricken and removed, and the parties shall refile conventionally their Notice of Selected Mediators using names from the ADR Mediator Panel List provided on the court's website or, alternatively, they may secure private mediation outside of the court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program." So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(js)
April 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Nicholas James Deleault on behalf of Deborah Smith Hatch(Deleault, Nicholas)
April 13, 2018 Filing 23 STRICKEN AND REMOVED Joint Mediation Statement: Mediation would be helpful. (Meier, Christopher) Modified on 4/16/2018 to strike and remove the document per Endorsed Order dated 4/16/2018 (js).
April 9, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Matthew Joseph Delude on behalf of Kenneth T. Rothwell(Delude, Matthew)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Assented to Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
April 4, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #20 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Kenneth T. Rothwell. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Motion to Extend Time to Answer. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(js)
April 4, 2018 Filing 21 ///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Kenneth T. Rothwell Only by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis(Meier, Christopher) Modified on 4/4/2018 to add: ///(js).
April 4, 2018 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Kenneth T. Rothwell.(Delude, Matthew)
April 4, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Joseph Delude on behalf of Kenneth T. Rothwell Attorney Matthew Joseph Delude added to party Kenneth T. Rothwell(pty:dft).(Delude, Matthew)
April 3, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing. Discovery Status Conference set for 12/31/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. At least 7 days prior to the date of the conference, the parties shall submit a joint statement regarding the status of discovery.(kad)
April 3, 2018 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 6/4/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 5/6/2019. JERS Statement due 5/6/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/20/2019. (js)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER approving with changes #17 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/4/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/1/2018. Discovery deadline 3/1/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 4/15/2018. (js)
March 30, 2018 Filing 17 Proposed Discovery Plan , Joint filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis. (Meier, Christopher)
March 28, 2018 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #16 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Deborah Smith Hatch. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
March 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B. Pribis on behalf of Deborah Smith Hatch Attorney William B. Pribis added to party Deborah Smith Hatch(pty:dft).(Pribis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Kenneth T. Rothwell.(js)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines Pre-Trial Conference and Filing of Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Motion granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Conference reset for 4/9/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/31/2018.(kad)
March 2, 2018 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines Pre-Trial Conference and Filing of Joint Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Ada T. Ceglanski, Michael A. Davis.(Meier, Christopher)
February 20, 2018 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Kenneth T. Rothwell by Michael A. Davis, Ada T. Ceglanski. Served/Mailed on 2/14/2018. Answer Follow Up on 3/7/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meier, Christopher)
February 13, 2018 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Western Maine Timberlands, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hurley, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Western Maine Timberlands, Inc..(Hurley, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 2/19/18 re #1 Complaint - New Case. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/19/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
February 9, 2018 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 2/19/18 filed by Western Maine Timberlands, Inc..(Hurley, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L. Hurley on behalf of Western Maine Timberlands, Inc. Attorney Elizabeth L. Hurley added to party Western Maine Timberlands, Inc.(pty:dft).(Hurley, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2018 AMENDED NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (CHANGE IN PRESIDING JUDGE ONLY). Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2018 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/1/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
February 6, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2018 11:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/1/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
January 29, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Deborah Smith Hatch disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Deleault, Nicholas)
January 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas James Deleault on behalf of Deborah Smith Hatch (Deleault, Nicholas)
January 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Deborah Smith Hatch.(Deleault, Nicholas)
January 17, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Western Maine Timberlands, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/11/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/1/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meier, Christopher)
January 17, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Deborah Smith Hatch , as Trustee of the Deborah Smith Hatch 1998 Revocable Trust by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/9/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meier, Christopher)
January 17, 2018 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Deborah Smith Hatch , Individually by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/9/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/30/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Meier, Christopher)
January 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Deborah Smith Hatch, Kenneth T. Rothwell, Western Maine Timberlands, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (lml)
January 3, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml)
December 31, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-752-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml)
December 31, 2017 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1603400 filed by Michael A. Davis, Ada T. Ceglanski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS044, #2 Summons - Waiver Summons - Hatch, #3 Summons - Waiver Summons - Trust, #4 Summons - Waiver Summons - Rothwell, #5 Summons - Waiver Summons - Western)(Meier, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Smith Hatch
Represented By: Nicholas James Deleault
Represented By: William B. Pribis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Rothwell
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Delude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Maine Timberlands, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada T. Ceglanski
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Davis
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?