Camp et al v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: David Camp and Keith Hadmack
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. and Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00378
Filed: May 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ///ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Bimbo Bakeries counterclaim for unjust enrichment is hereby dismissed; denying 56 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Court-Authorized Notice; denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration re: 54 Order on Motion to Certify Class. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Certify Class Conditionally under the FLSA. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lml)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss filed by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Answer Follow Up on 12/31/2018. (lml)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp et al v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Camp
Represented By: Christopher B. Coughlin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Matthew Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hadmack
Represented By: Christopher B. Coughlin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Matthew Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?