English v. Atrium Medical Corporation

Plaintiff: Claudia English
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00629
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CANCELLED. At the request of parties' lead counsel, the Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST is cancelled.(de)
August 30, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting (876) Motion to Extend Time JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE in case 1:16-md-02753-LM and the respective pleading in the underlying civil cases. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
August 30, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER re: 875 Notice of Subpoena in 16-md-2753-LM. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
August 30, 2018 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 3:00 PM EST before Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
August 23, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER MDL Transfer In No. CTO-10. Conditional transfer of case: New Jersey, 2:18-cv-11832. (de)
August 20, 2018 7 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Telephone Conference held on 8/16/2018. Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey, Telephone # 603 225-1454. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number.NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2018.(de)
August 16, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The court approves the request of the parties outlined in paragraph 3 of the joint agenda (doc. no. 842) to amend Section V. E. of the Plaintiff Fact Sheet in Amended Case Management Order 3G. Since the original order (doc. no. 135) and the amended order (doc. no. 135-1) included Exhibit C as part of the order, the entire order and all attachments (as amended) will be docketed in the original docket entry as Second Amended Case Management Order 3G (doc. no. 135-2). To be clear, document no. 135-2 is replacing document nos. 135 and 135-1. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
August 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2018. (Court Reporter: Sandra Bailey) (Pltfs Attys: Jonathan Orent, David Selby, Susan Lowry, Adam Evans, Anne Schiavone) (Defts Attys: Enjolique Aytch, Pierre Chabot, Jack Friberg)(Total Hearing Time: 17 minutes) (de)
August 16, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Atrium Medical Corporation by Atrium Medical Corporation. (Aytch, Enjolique)
August 13, 2018 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER re: 841 in 16-md-2753-LM and the respective pleadings in the civil cases JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
August 9, 2018 5 NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT AGENDA FOR THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUGUST 16, 2018 by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Revised Plaintiffs' Fact Sheet)(Turner, Hugh)
August 9, 2018 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to JOINT MOTION TO AMEND PROCEDURAL ORDER AND TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING filed by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Turner, Hugh)
August 9, 2018 3 NOTICE of Notice of Initial Discovery Pool Selections by Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC.(Turner, Hugh)
July 19, 2018 2 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2018. Court Reporter: Susan Bateman, Telephone # 603 225-1453. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number.NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2018.(de)
July 18, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
July 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-629-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 17, 2018 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1686582 filed by Claudia English. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Oliver, Alyson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2018: #3 Atty Signature Block Complaint) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. Atrium Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia English
Represented By: Alyson L Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atrium Medical Corporation
Represented By: Pierre A. Chabot
Represented By: Hugh J. Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Enjolique D. Aytch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?