Robert v. Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Robert
Defendant: Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00632
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/13/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 03:00 PM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 10/15/2019. JERS Statement due 10/15/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/29/2019. (js)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-5 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/16/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/10/2018. Discovery deadline 6/17/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 4/30/2019. (js)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.. (Ford, Debra)
July 30, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/4/2018. (de)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc..(Scott, K.)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-00741, Rockingham County Superior Court(Ford, Debra)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. [Replaces Doc. No. 2] (Ford, Debra)
July 18, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
July 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-632-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by K. Joshua Scott on behalf of Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc. Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.(pty:dft).(Scott, K.)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 REPLACED BY DOCUMENT #4 Disclosure Statement by Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ford, Debra) Modified on 7/23/2018 to add: Replaced by (de).
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham County Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-00741 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1687179) filed by Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 8/8/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Transfer to State Court, #3 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ford, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert v. Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuro-Rehab Associates, Inc.
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Robert
Represented By: Leslie C. Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?