Conroy v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert L. Conroy
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company and Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00641
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #9 MOTION to Dismiss under FRCivP Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Robert L. Conroy. Follow up on Reply on 9/19/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Carlier, Laura)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/3/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss under FRCivP Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 9/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law supporting Motion)(Kerrigan, Timothy)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b).( Answer Follow Up on 8/31/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).). So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy G. Kerrigan on behalf of Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc. (Kerrigan, Timothy)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Kerrigan, Timothy)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to August 31, 2018 , Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc.. Attorney Timothy G. Kerrigan added to party Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Kerrigan, Timothy)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2018-cv-00435, Hillsborough County County Superior Court(Coan, Geoffrey)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by The Dow Chemical Company.(Coan, Geoffrey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey M. Coan on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company (Coan, Geoffrey)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by The Dow Chemical Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Coan, Geoffrey)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by The Dow Chemical Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. The Dow Chemical Company shall file a disclosure statement by July 27, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 7/27/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
July 20, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-641-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Superior Court - North, case number 216-2018-cv-00435 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1688410) filed by The Dow Chemical Company. Answer Follow Up on 8/10/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Certificate of Service re Removal, #3 Exhibit B: Letter to State Clerk with Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coan, Geoffrey) Modified on 7/20/2018 to update Exhibit Descriptions (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conroy v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Coan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sudbury Lumber Company, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy G. Kerrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Conroy
Represented By: John G. Cronin
Represented By: Laura Nicole Carlier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?